skip to content

Attia, Menat

CPSO#: 97579

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Summerville Family Health Team
101 Queensway West, fifth floor
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 272-9700
Fax: (905) 272-1416 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Menat Attia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Attia ( CPSO# 97579 )

Business Address:
5th Floor
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 272-9700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MENAT ATTIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATTIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014