skip to content

Atrie, Damon

CPSO#: 91136

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Department of Emergency Medicine
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C1A5
Canada
Phone: (416) 259-6671
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 601
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Canada
Phone: (905) 281-9898
Fax: (905) 281-9143
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Emergency Department
Maple ON  L6A 4Z3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

101-9401 Jane St
Mackenzie Health Urgent Care Clinic
Maple ON  L6A 4H7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

10 Trench St
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Emergency Department
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 9058831212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Damon Atrie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Atrie ( CPSO# 91136 )

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Department of Emergency Medicine
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Suite 601
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 281-9898

Business Address:
3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Emergency Department
Maple ON  L6A 4Z3

Business Address:
101-9401 Jane St
Mackenzie Health Urgent Care Clinic
Maple ON  L6A 4H7

Business Address:
10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health
Emergency Department
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAMON ATRIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATRIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014