skip to content

Atrey, Amit

CPSO#: 97167

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Dec 2016
EXPIRY DATE
18 Dec 2023
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 19 Dec 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Hindi, Italian

Education:University of London, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Orthopedic Surgery
804 - 55 Queen St E
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone: (416) 864-5342
Fax: (416) 864-5398 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Amit Atrey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Waddell ( CPSO# 21620 )
Dr. A. Atrey ( CPSO# 97167 )

Business Address:
St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Orthopedic Surgery
804 - 55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 864-5392

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:19 Dec 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 28 Feb 2012
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 29 Feb 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Dec 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Amit Atrey may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division of Orthopedic Surgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Atrey holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Atrey no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Atrey's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Atrey's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on December 19, 2016. In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on December 18, 2023.