skip to content

Atkinson, Mary Lynne

CPSO#: 28053

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Jackson-Hughes, Mary Lynne (used until: 24 Aug 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Thunder Bay District Health Unit 999 Balmoral Street Thunder Bay ON P7B 6E7
Date Received: 16 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016