Atia, Mina (CPSO#: 95634)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Neurophysiology Lab 3M-03
St. Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6119
Fax: 416-530-6360
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Bayview Campus
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: 416-480-6100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mina Atia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Atia ( CPSO# 95634 )

Business Address:
Neurophysiology Lab 3M-03
St. Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6119

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MINA ATIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016