skip to content

Athreya, Sriharsha

CPSO#: 88609

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mysore University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System.St Catharines
Diagnostic Imaging
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Avella Injury and Pain Clinic
5045 Mainway,Unit 118
Burlington
Burlington ON  L7L 5Z1
Canada
Phone: 9053157007
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

115 Delhi St
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

115 Delhi St
guelph gen hospital
diagnostic imaging
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Athreya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Athreya ( CPSO# 88609 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
Medical Imaging
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:02 Jun 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Interventional Radiology Effective:05 Oct 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jun 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2015 Active
 Dr.  Sriharsha  Athreya  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  Diagnostic
            Radiology.