skip to content

Atherton, William

CPSO#: 29782

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Atherton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 11 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Feb 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 2014