skip to content

Athar, Humera

CPSO#: 91841

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Mar 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 23 Mar 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Pashto, Urdu

Education:Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
Off Site Adolescent Clinic
3640 Wells Street
Windsor ON  N9C 1T9
Phone: (519) 258-0484
Fax: (519) 258-0488 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

3640 Wells Street
Windsor ON  N9C 1T9
Canada
Phone: 519-258-0484
Fax: 248-258-0488
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Site/ MaryvaleLocation
Department of Pyschiatry
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Humera Athar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Athar ( CPSO# 91841 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
Off Site Adolescent Clinic
3640 Wells Street
Windsor ON  N9C 1T9
Phone Number: (519) 258-0484


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:23 Mar 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Feb 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011 Active
 Dr.  Humera  Athar  may practise medicine independently in child and adolescent
            psychiatry, only.