skip to content

Athaide, Sylvia Bella

CPSO#: 31824

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Mar 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Mar 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sylvia Athaide Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2017
Corporation Name: Gregory Athaide Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Athaide ( CPSO# 31824 )
Dr. G. Athaide ( CPSO# 80895 )

Business Address:
Whitby Medical Arts Centre
Suite 16
1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone Number: (905) 231-1555

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Solutions Tel: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 08 Feb 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Mar 2017