skip to content

Atfield, Alexandre David

CPSO#: 97719

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
26 Hospital Dr
The Peterborough Clinic
Suite 303
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6853
Fax: (705) 740-6863 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Francis Memorial Hospital
7 St. Francis Memorial Drive
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Canada
Phone: (613) 756-3044
Fax: (613) 756-0106
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Rainbow Valley Community Health Cen
Killaloe ON  K0J 2A0
Canada
Phone: 613-757-0004
Fax: 613-757-0005
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Emergency Department
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: 705-743-2121
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. Atfield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Atfield ( CPSO# 97719 )

Business Address:
26 Hospital Dr
The Peterborough Clinic
Suite 303
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: 7057406853

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRE DAVID ATFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATFIELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2014