skip to content

Atapattu, Vidura Indika

CPSO#: 94543

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Sinhala

Education:Doneck Medical University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Innisfil Health Collaborative
Rizzardo Health centre
7325 Yonge Street
Suite2300
Innisfil ON  L9S2M6
Phone: (705) 436-2251
Fax: 7054367991 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Vidura Atapattu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Atapattu ( CPSO# 94543 )

Business Address:
Innisfil Health Collabortive
2300-7325 Yonge Street
Innisfil ON  L9S 2M6
Phone Number: (705) 436-2251


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Sri Lanka

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VIDURA INDIKA ATAPATTU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATAPATTU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 25 Oct 2010 to 16 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 17 Jan 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 18 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2013