skip to content

Atack, David Michael

CPSO#: 28798

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Oct 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Atack Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 5795 Martin St N Box 605 Almonte, ON K0A 1A0
Date Received: 23 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:28 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017