skip to content

Asuquo, Queenette

CPSO#: 97115

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: Oduwole, Queenette (used until: 19 Jul 2018 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calabar, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
Department of Emergency Medicine
80 Grand Ave W
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Queenette Oduwole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 5 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. QUEENETTE ASUQUO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASUQUO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Dec 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2018