skip to content

Asuquo, Queenette Emem

CPSO#: 97115

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Oduwole, Queenette (used until: 19 Jul 2018 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calabar, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
Department of Emergency Medicine
80 Grand Ave W
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone: (519) 3526400 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

325 MARGARET AVE
WALLACEBURG
Chatham ON  N8A 2A7
Canada
Phone: 5193526400
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Queenette Oduwole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 5 2013
Corporation Name: Queenette Asuquo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Asuquo ( CPSO# 97115 )

Business Address:
80 Grand Ave W
Chatham ON  N7L 1B7


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. QUEENETTE EMEM ASUQUO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASUQUO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Dec 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2018