skip to content

Asselstine, Robert Charles

CPSO#: 21906

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jun 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 17 Jul 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingsway Health Centre
5542 Ann St
PO Box 819
Manotick ON  K4M 1A7
Phone: (613) 692-5433
Fax: (613) 692-5435 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Asselstine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Asselstine ( CPSO# 21906 )

Business Address:
222 Beechwood Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1L 8A7
Phone Number: (613) 842-7633

Business Address:
Kingsway Health Centre
P O Box 819
5542 Ann Street
Manotick ON  K4M 1A7
Phone Number: (613) 692-5433

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1997
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 26 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 17 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 12 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 13 Sep 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 13 Sep 2019 Active
             As from September 13, 2019, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Robert Charles
            Asselstine in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Asselstine to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR.  ROBERT CHARLES ASSELSTINE
                                          ("Dr. Asselstine")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Asselstine, certificate of registration number 21906, am a member
                  of the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Asselstine, acknowledge that the College conducted an
                  investigation bearing File Number 1103593 (the "Investigation") into
                  whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my
                  family practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Asselstine, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective as of September 13, 2019.  

            (5)   Resignation of Prescribing Privileges 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Asselstine, acknowledge that I have executed the Prescribing
                        Resignation Letter to Health Canada, which is attached hereto as
                        Schedule "A" (the "Resignation Letter").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Asselstine, consent to the College sending the Resignation
                        Letter to Health Canada on my behalf.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Asselstine, undertake that I will not issue new
                        prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any
                        of the following substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                  
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27); 
                  
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19); 
                  
                              (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                              Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached
                              hereto as Schedule "B"; and links to the current regulatory
                              lists are attached hereto as Schedule "C")
                  
                        (v)   Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and
                              Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, with a link to the
                              current regulatory list attached hereto as Schedule "D");
                  
                              and as amended from time to time. 
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Asselstine, undertake that I will return any supplies of the
                  substances referred to in section (5)(c) above that are presently in my
                  possession, in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and secure manner, as
                  stipulated in the College's Policy Number 8-12, "Prescribing Drugs."

            (7)   I, Dr. Asselstine, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                  location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited
                  to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health
                  Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively
                  my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of
                  executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform
                  the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of
                  commencing practice at that location.

            (8)   Posting a Sign 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Asselstine, undertake that I shall post a sign in all
                        waiting rooms and in each examination and consulting room, in all
                        my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in
                        the form set out at Schedule "E."  For further clarity, this sign
                        shall state as follows: 
                  
                                          IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                              Dr. Asselstine must not prescribe or administer any of the
                              following: 
                  
                              -     Narcotic Drugs
                              -     Narcotic Preparations
                              -     Controlled Drugs
                              -     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                              -     Monitored Drugs
                  
                              Further information may be found on the College of Physicians
                              and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Asselstine, undertake to post a certified translation in any
                        language in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (8)(a) above, in all waiting rooms and in each examination
                        and consulting room, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location, in the form set out at Schedule "E." 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Asselstine, undertake to provide the certified translation
                        described in section (8)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Asselstine, undertake that if I elect, after the execution
                        of this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I
                        will notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Asselstine, undertake to provide to the College the
                        certified translation described in section (8)(c) prior to
                        beginning to provide services in any language described in section
                        (8)(d).
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Asselstine, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Asselstine, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Asselstine, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Asselstine, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Asselstine, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (14)  I, Dr. Asselstine, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Asselstine, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Asselstine, acknowledge that, in addition to this
                        Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above,
                        the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during
                        the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Asselstine
                        engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in the
                        practice of family medicine. As a result of the investigation: 
                  
                        Dr. Asselstine must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing
                        prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                  
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27); 
                  
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19); 
                  
                        (v)   Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and
                              Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);        
                  
                        and as amended from time to time.
                  
                        Dr. Asselstine must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting
                        rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all Practice
                        Locations, which states as follows: 
                  
                                          IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                              Dr. Asselstine must not prescribe or administer any of the
                              following: 
                  
                              -     Narcotic Drugs
                              -     Narcotic Preparations
                              -     Controlled Drugs
                              -     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                              -     Monitored Drugs
                  
                              Further information may be found on the College of Physicians
                              and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Asselstine, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                  with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts
                  by the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in
                  order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Asselstine, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS, and any person who or institution
                  that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor
                  my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Asselstine, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                  consent forms, attached hereto as Schedule "F" and Schedule "G",
                  respectively.

            (19)  I, Dr. Asselstine, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: September 13, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Charles Asselstine to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 13, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Asselstine engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in the practice of family medicine. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Asselstine must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:

(i)Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);

(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(v) Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);

and as amended from time to time.

Dr. Asselstine must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Asselstine must not prescribe or administer any of the following:

- Narcotic Drugs
- Narcotic Preparations
- Controlled Drugs
- Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
- Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca