skip to content

Assal, Angela Frances

CPSO#: 97588

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room H158
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-4760
Fax: 416-480-6875 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Angela Assal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Assal ( CPSO# 97588 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room H121
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6056

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANGELA FRANCES ASSAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASSAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016