skip to content

Assaad, Dalal Morcos

CPSO#: 29030

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Apr 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Medical Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4908
Fax: (416) 480-6897 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dermpath - 23 Elkhorn Drive, #5
Toronto ON  M2K 3E8
Canada
Phone: (647) 347-6908
Fax: (647) 347-6905
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Dalal Assaad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Assaad ( CPSO# 29030 )

Business Address:
Suite 5
23 Elkhorn Drive
Toronto ON  M2K 3E8
Phone Number: (647) 347-6908

Business Address:
401 - 1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone Number: (416) 482-7000

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite M-1
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4908

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:23 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective:27 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DALAL MORCOS ASSAAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASSAAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 1977