skip to content

Asrat, Getnet Abebe

CPSO#: 87063

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English

Education:Addis Ababa University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rideau Valley Health Service
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2J 5V7
Phone: (613) 258-8710
Fax: (613) 440-3238 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

220 Preston street
Ottawa ON  K2G 4B5
Canada
Phone: (613) 288-2437
Fax: (613) 680-6420
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: G. Asrat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Asrat ( CPSO# 87063 )

Business Address:
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2J 5V7
Phone Number: (613) 258-8710

Business Address:
225 Preston Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 7R1
Phone Number: (613) 482-0118

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GETNET ABEBE ASRAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASRAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009