skip to content

Asrar, Farhan Muhammad

CPSO#: 89957

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Nov 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glen Gate Medical Centre
2385 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Mississauga ON  L5L 6A4
Phone: (905) 607-6661
Fax: (905) 607 5552 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

C/O Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
(Credit Valley & Summerville FMTUs)
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Farhan M. Asrar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Asrar ( CPSO# 89957 )

Business Address:
2385 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Mississauga ON  L5L 6A4
Phone Number: 905-607-6661

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FARHAN MUHAMMAD ASRAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASRAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Nov 2008 to 24 Jan 2009
AVP - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Jan 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2010 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2012 to 06 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 07 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2014