skip to content

Asraf, Ghada Omar Shaban

CPSO#: 86072

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 09 Apr 2007 to 29 May 2007
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 30 May 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2011