skip to content

Aspler, Aviva Leah

CPSO#: 87467

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 13 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jul 2001 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Aug 2013