skip to content

Asmer, Mehmet Selim

CPSO#: 97565

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church St, PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7011 Ext. 39258
Fax: 9054727371 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. S. Asmer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Asmer ( CPSO# 97565 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P.O. Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEHMET SELIM ASMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017