skip to content

Aslahi, Ramona

CPSO#: 85073

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Azari, English, Farsi

Education:Islamic Azad University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Hemodialysis Unit
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

#113 385 Silver Star Blvd
Toronto ON  M1V 0E3
Canada
Phone: 416-551-2888
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

6023 Yonge St
Thornhill ON  M2M 3W2
Canada
Phone: 416-916-2733
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ramona Aslahi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Aslahi ( CPSO# 85073 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Hemodialysis Unit
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Business Address:
6023 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  M2M 3W2
Phone Number: (416) 916-2733

Business Address:
113 - 385 Silverstar Boulevard
Toronto ON  M1V 0E3
Phone Number: (416) 551-2888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 30 Nov 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAMONA ASLAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASLAHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2009 to 30 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2010 to 30 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011