skip to content

Askew, Michele Leigh

CPSO#: 96086

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital-Ouellette
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4444 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
1453 Prince Rd
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Canada
Phone: (519) 257-5111
Fax: 519-257-5455
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Michele Askew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Askew ( CPSO# 96086 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 257-5111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHELE LEIGH ASKEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASKEW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013