skip to content

Asim, Muhammad

CPSO#: 90157

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Drive
Department of Pediatrics
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Ext. 4108 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

700 Ross Ave E
Timmins ON  P4N8P2
Canada
Phone: 7052676370
Fax: 7052676311
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

80 Thickson Road S
Whitby ON  L1N7T2
Canada
Phone: 9056686448
Fax: 9056684023
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Unit 204
Alexander Medical Building
849 Alexander Court
Peterborough ON  K9J7H8
Canada
Phone: 705 743 7575
Fax: 705 743 0770
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street N
Lindsay ON  K9V4M8
Canada
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Muhammad Asim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Asim ( CPSO# 90157 )

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
Suite 204
849 Alexander Building
Peterborough ON  K9J 7H8
Phone Number: (705) 743-7575

Business Address:
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Business Address:
80 Thickson Road South
Whitby ON  L1N 7T2
Phone Number: (905) 668-6448

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology Effective:27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD ASIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 06 Mar 2009
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 07 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
AVP - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2017