skip to content

Ashtarani, Peyvand

CPSO#: 95142

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5460 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2N 6K7
Phone: 416-250-7171
Fax: 416-250-0323 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Peyvand Ashtarani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ashtarani ( CPSO# 95142 )

Business Address:
204 - 5460 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 6K7
Phone Number: (416) 250-7171

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PEYVAND ASHTARANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHTARANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013