skip to content

Ashraf, Kaleem

CPSO#: 91630

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Liaquat Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5547 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 5Y2
Phone: (289) 296-4500
Fax: (289) 296-5537 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines ON
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: 905-379-4747
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kaleem Ashraf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ashraf ( CPSO# 91630 )

Business Address:
Portage Medical Family Health Team
5547 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 5Y2
Phone Number: (289) 296-4500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KALEEM ASHRAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHRAF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 18 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
AVP - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015