skip to content

Ashok, Dhandapani

CPSO#: 99529

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Oct 2012
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 16 Oct 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil, Telugu

Education:University of Madras, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Campus, Suite B1-166
800 Commissioners Road East
Division of Pediatrics
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8792
Fax: (519) 685-8105 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ashok Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ashok ( CPSO# 99529 )

Business Address:
London Health Science Centre-Victoria Campus
Division of Pediatrics
Suite B1-166
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8792

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Oct 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Mar 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Mar 2017 Active
             1.    Dr. Dhandapani Ashok may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Paediatrics, Division of Gastroenterology, University of Western
                        Ontario, in which Dr. Ashok holds an academic appointment at the
                        rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Ashok  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Ashok's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Ashok's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on October 16, 2012, and expires on June 30,
                  2019.  Upon renewal of Dr. Ashok's academic appointment at the University
                  of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the
                  limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.