skip to content

Ashbury, Edwin Lindner

CPSO#: 32200

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: E.L. Ashbury Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Kingston General Hospital Department of Anaesthesiology Victory 2 76 Stuart Street Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Date Received: 23 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017