skip to content

Ascher, Ilana Stephanie

CPSO#: 94904

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 14 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Schiffman, Ilana Stephanie (used until: 17 Jul 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
5927 Bathurst Street
Toronto, ONT
M2R 3T5
Toronto ON  M2R 3T5
Phone: (416) 652-9630
Fax: (416) 224-9630 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Mar 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Jul 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013 Active
 Dr.  Ilana  Stephanie  Ascher  may  practise  medicine  independently in family
            medicine, only.