skip to content

Arya, Neehar

CPSO#: 92633

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 14 Jun 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Critical Care Medicine
2075 Bayview Avenue Room D1 08
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

13411
149 Avenue
Edmonton AB  T6V1L1
Canada
County: 
Electoral District: 

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 12 Apr 2010 to 23 Jun 2010
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine

University Of Toronto, 24 Jun 2010 to 12 Apr 2011
CF - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jun 2021 Active
 Dr. NEEHAR ARYA may practise medicine independently in emergency medicine, only.