skip to content

Arya, Aman Viny

CPSO#: 90670

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10720 Yonge Street
Unit 203
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C9
Phone: 905-508-7504
Fax: 905-780-1399 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 905-883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Aman Viny Arya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Arya ( CPSO# 90670 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
10720 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C9
Phone Number: (905) 508-7504

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:06 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMAN VINY ARYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARYA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013