skip to content

Arvinte, Galina

CPSO#: 85350

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Kiev Medical Institute, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
541 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 3A1
Phone: (905) 685-1381
Fax: (905) 687-4871 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Arvinte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Arvinte ( CPSO# 85349 )
Dr. G. Arvinte ( CPSO# 85350 )

Business Address:
403 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 1L5
Phone Number: (905) 984-8766

Business Address:
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 684-7271

Business Address:
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 732-6111

Business Address:
541 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 3A1
Phone Number: (905) 685-1381


Corporation Name: Galina Arvinte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Arvinte ( CPSO# 85350 )

Business Address:
541 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 3A1
Phone Number: (905) 685-1381

Business Address:
403 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 1L5
Phone Number: (905) 984-8766

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 684-7271

Business Address:
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 732-6111


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:08 Jan 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GALINA ARVINTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARVINTE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2006