skip to content

Arumugam, Bhavani R

CPSO#: 87597

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Sep 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malay, Tamil

Education:Sri Ramachandra Med Col\Research Instit, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Palermo Medical Centre
Suite 460
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (289) 837-0222
Fax: (289) 837-1222 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

9985 McVean Drive
Unit 4
Brampton ON  L6P 4K8
Canada
Phone: (905) 794-8844
Fax: (905) 794-8833
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

185 Ontario St S
Milton ON  L9T 2M4
Canada
Phone: 9058256000
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

7120 Hurontario St
Mississauga ON  L5W 1N4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bhavani Arumugam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Arumugam ( CPSO# 87597 )

Business Address:
Palermo Medical Centre
2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 190
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (289) 837-0222

Business Address:
9985 McVean Drive
Suite 4
Brampton ON  L6P 4K8
Phone Number: (905) 794-8844

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Aug 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BHAVANI R ARUMUGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARUMUGAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 24 Nov 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Nov 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2009

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: November 7, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)