skip to content

Arul, Sara-Anne

CPSO#: 95576

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prince Edward Family Health Team
Suite 4, 35 Bridge street
Picton, ON
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone: 613-471-1906
Fax: 613-968-2100 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sara-Anne Arul Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Arul ( CPSO# 95576 )

Business Address:
4 - 35 Bridge Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 471-1906

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARA-ANNE ARUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARUL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2014