skip to content

Arthurs, James Richard

CPSO#: 90104

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Dec 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Washington, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Northwestern Health Unit 210 First Street North Kenora, ON P9N 2K4
Date Received: 02 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014