skip to content

Arshad, Farakh

CPSO#: 99331

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Oct 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Indiana

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FARAKH ARSHAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARSHAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 23 Oct 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Jan 2016
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2014