skip to content

Arsenault, Julie

CPSO#: 89485

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Hamilton Health Sciences Corp Juravinski Cancer Centre 699 Concession Street Hamilton ON L8V 5C2
Date Received: 25 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017