skip to content

Arruda, Amanda Sousa

CPSO#: 100964

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1892 Davenport Road
Toronto ON  M6N 1B7
Phone: 4166586812
Fax: 4166584611 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMANDA SOUSA ARRUDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARRUDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2015