skip to content

Arora, Shefali Dhindsa

CPSO#: 87714

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grandview Medical Centre
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone: (519) 623-4200
Fax: (519) 623-2546 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Monkhouse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2017
Corporation Name: S. and H. Arora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Arora ( CPSO# 85872 )
Dr. S. Arora ( CPSO# 87714 )

Business Address:
Grandview Medical Centre
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 623-4200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Sep 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Apr 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Apr 2011 Active
             Dr.  Shefali  Dhindsa  Arora  may  practise  medicine  independently  in Family
            Medicine, only.