skip to content

Arora, Harpreet Singh

CPSO#: 85872

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Dec 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 24 Dec 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grandview Medical Centre
Family Health Team
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone: (519) 623-4200
Fax: (519) 623-2546 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Monkhouse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2017
Corporation Name: S. and H. Arora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Arora ( CPSO# 85872 )
Dr. S. Arora ( CPSO# 87714 )

Business Address:
Grandview Medical Centre
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 623-4200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jan 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Feb 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011 Active
             Dr.  Harpreet  Singh  Arora  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  Family
            Medicine, only.