skip to content

Arora, Danny

CPSO#: 91130

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Oakville Medical Centre
203 - 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville, ON
L6M 1M1
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: 289-813-5075
Fax: 289-813-5082 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Danny Arora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Arora ( CPSO# 91130 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (289) 813-5075

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:31 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANNY ARORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARORA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 29 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 30 Jul 2010 to 29 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 30 Jul 2011 to 29 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 30 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 30 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2014