skip to content

Aronnilakkara, Priya Prasad

CPSO#: 89900

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Sep 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:J. J. M. Medical College, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Front Street W, Box 49
Unit C021D
Toronto ON  M5V 3K2
Phone: 416-599-9000 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Spadina Ave
Toronto ON  M5T 2C2
Canada
Phone: 4162038600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PRIYA PRASAD ARONNILAKKARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARONNILAKKARA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 29 Jul 2013 to 10 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 11 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 08 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 09 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 05 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 06 Jun 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 29 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2008