skip to content

Arno Clua, Ana Isabel

CPSO#: 94600

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad Autonoma De Barcelona, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Nov 2010 to 23 Jan 2011
PEAP - CF - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 24 Jan 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
CF - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2011