skip to content

Armstrong, Mitchel Douglas

CPSO#: 98026

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3027 Harvester Road
Suite 506 - 5th floor
Burlington ON  L7N 3G7
Phone: (905) 333-5100 Ext. Ext. 3 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mitchel D. Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Armstrong ( CPSO# 98026 )

Business Address:
3027 Harvester Road
Suite 506
Burlington ON  L7N 3G7
Phone Number: (905) 333-5100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MITCHEL DOUGLAS ARMSTRONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMSTRONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017