skip to content

Armstrong, Kyle Richard

CPSO#: 95308

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 May 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
105 Shipley St
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Phone: (519) 482-3000
Fax: 5194827648 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

395 Carrie st
Strathroy ON  N7G 3E2
Canada
Phone: 519 245 1550 Ext. 5533
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K. Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Armstrong ( CPSO# 95308 )

Business Address:
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3E2
Phone Number: (519) 245-1550

Business Address:
105 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 482-3000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:16 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KYLE RICHARD ARMSTRONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMSTRONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 2014