skip to content

Armstrong, Barry Donald

CPSO#: 33481

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jun 1982
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional HSC
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000 Ext. 6290 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Barry D. Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Armstrong ( CPSO# 33481 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional HSC
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6290

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BARRY DONALD ARMSTRONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMSTRONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2001
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2001
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 01 Nov 2002
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 05 Mar 2003
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 26 Feb 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 2011