skip to content

Armitage, Marshal Spencer

CPSO#: 91872

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Oct 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Boston University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
288 Groveland street
Haverhill MA  01830
United States
Phone: 978-373-3851

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Colorado
USA - Massachusetts
USA - New Hampshire

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARSHAL SPENCER ARMITAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMITAGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2009