skip to content

Armitage, Donald Pears

CPSO#: 20935

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Mar 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Jul 1967

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Iron Mountain Storage Company Tel: 1-800-327-8345
Date Received: 04 Jun 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:11 Mar 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Mar 2008

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Dec 1986
Summary:

 In December 1986, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Armitage guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the 
 standard of practice of the profession.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Armitage's 
 licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months, but that this suspension would 
 itself be suspended indefinitely upon his filing proof with the Registrar of the College that he 
 had completed a continuing medical education program in the area of acid-base disorders, such a 
 course to be satisfactory to the Registrar.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 08 Dec 1986