skip to content

Arif, Muhammad

CPSO#: 91878

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Muhammad Arif Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 17 Jul 2009 to 21 Aug 2009
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 22 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014